This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 07/06/2022 at 03:28:24 (UTC).

CROWN POINTE INVESTMENTS, INC. VS HWP PROPERTIES, LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/06/2022 CROWN POINTE INVESTMENTS, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HWP PROPERTIES, LLC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0042

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CROWN POINTE INVESTMENTS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

HWP PROPERTIES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

EPSTEIN FAMILY 2019 INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT CO., LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRAUN CRAIG D

 

Court Documents

Complaint

01/06/2022: Complaint

Summons Issued and Filed

01/06/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Electronic Rejection Notice

01/07/2022: Electronic Rejection Notice

Order to Show Cause

01/07/2022: Order to Show Cause

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

01/06/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

01/14/2022: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

01/14/2022: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Notice of Settlement Unconditional

04/19/2022: Notice of Settlement Unconditional

Request for Dismissal (Entire)

05/27/2022: Request for Dismissal (Entire)

Ruling

04/19/2022: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Dismissal (Entire); Comment: With prejudice as to Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CROWN POINTE INVESTMENTS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Ruling; Result: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Settlement Unconditional; Comment: Notice of Settlement Unconditional; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CROWN POINTE INVESTMENTS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Epstein Family 2019 Investment Management Co, LLC, a California limited liability company, via sub service; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CROWN POINTE INVESTMENTS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to HWP Properties, LLC a California limited liability company, via personal service; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CROWN POINTE INVESTMENTS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 04/25/2022 Hearing Time: 8:30 amHearing Department/Division: J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: TO: CRAIG D. BRAUN attorney RE: Civil Case Cover Sheet (from original filing)REASON: the required page 2 was not filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CROWN POINTE INVESTMENTS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CROWN POINTE INVESTMENTS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CROWN POINTE INVESTMENTS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRAUN, CRAIG D