This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:49:18 (UTC).

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC VS WESSON

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WESSON. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1837

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC

Defendant

WESSON, JENNIFER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DUENAS, LUIS

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) 03/19/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: Cont'd from 03/19/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC; Awarded Against: WESSON, JENNIFER; Amount; Damages: $1,081.05; Costs: $315.00; Total: $1396.05; Party: Names: CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC; WESSON, JENNIFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: in favor of Crown Asset Management, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment CCP 585 1033(2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: W/O Prejudice as to DOES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Court Judgment - Comment: as to JENNIFER WESSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) 03/19/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: OF NADER S SABAWI IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO JENNIFER WESSON , SUB SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 04/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ABC LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less