This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:48:48 (UTC).

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC VS PIENTA

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PIENTA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1828

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC

Defendant

PIENTA, NICOLE R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DUENAS, LUIS

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Stipulation and Judgment; missing Defendant's First App. Fee

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Full Satisfaction - Comment: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: crc 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Stipulated Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketJudgment (After Conditional Settlement) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketStipulation - Comment: agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Stipulation and Judgment; missing Defendant's First App. Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: DOES 1-100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Conditional (JBSIS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO NICOLE R PIENTA , PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 05/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ABC LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less