This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 11/16/2021 at 09:32:56 (UTC).

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC ASSIGNEE OF COMENITY BANK (KAY JEWELERS) VS MARTINEZ

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC ASSIGNEE OF COMENITY BANK KAY JEWELERS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MARTINEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5627

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC ASSIGNEE OF COMENITY BANK (KAY JEWELERS)

Defendant

MARTINEZ, ERIC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIDUGUEN, CHRISTINE S

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Eric Martinez via sub service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/28/20217:34 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: re: Reduced Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Crown Asset Management LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Siduguen, Christine S.