This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/12/2023 at 07:45:20 (UTC).

CROSS VS SHELDON, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/07/2017 CROSS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SHELDON, LLC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0260

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CROSS, TERRY

Defendant

SHELDON, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DOUGLASS JONATHAN W

MARTIN GEORGE F

PARRIS R REX

WHEELER ALEXANDER R

Defendant Attorneys

BURKHOLDER SHANNA E

CLARK STEVEN C

 

Court Documents

Motion to Take Deposition

Motion to Take Deposition 07/12/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 6/19/18 Defendant, SHELDON, LLC Motion for Leave to Take a Subsequent Deposition of Plaintiff Terry Cross ResID: 31220

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition 10/15/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Filed 10-12-18 Moving Party: Plaintiff Ex-Parte Application to Continue Trial

Ruling

Ruling 05/13/2019: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Ruling 12/14/2018: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Motion (Pre-Disposition)

Motion (Pre-Disposition) 01/17/2019: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 12/17/2018, Defendant: Sheldon, LLC., Motion to Immediately Hear, or in the Alternative to Advance the Hearing on Plainitff's Motion to Quash Defendant's Subpoenas, ResID: 33760

Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further

Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further 10/09/2018: Judicial Officer: Friedman, Gary T.; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: FMSC Cont. from 9/21/18

Ruling

Ruling 04/25/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 03:00 PM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Ruling 10/15/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Motion to Quash (Pre-Disposition)

Motion to Quash (Pre-Disposition) 03/04/2019: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 11/21/2018, Plaintiff: Terry Cross, Motion to Quash Subpoenas, ResID: 33574

Ruling

05/13/2019: Ruling

Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further

04/11/2019: Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further

Motion to Quash (Pre-Disposition)

03/04/2019: Motion to Quash (Pre-Disposition)

Ruling

01/29/2019: Ruling

Motion for Judgment on Pleadings

01/24/2019: Motion for Judgment on Pleadings

Motion (Pre-Disposition)

01/17/2019: Motion (Pre-Disposition)

Ruling

12/14/2018: Ruling

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

10/15/2018: Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

Ruling

10/15/2018: Ruling

124 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Notice of Destruction of Subpoenaed Records Not Admitted

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2019
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Notice of Entry of Dismissal; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CROSS, TERRY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2019
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Request for Dismissal (Entire); Comment: With Prejudice; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CROSS, TERRY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/13/2019
View Court Documents

HearingHearing Type: Ruling; Result: Ruling

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2019
View Court Documents

HearingHearing Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 1; Result: Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2019
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Miscellaneous Filing; Comment: Consent of parties or their lawyers to confer separately with settlement conference judge pro tem ret. Gary T. Friedman in department 1.; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CROSS, TERRY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2019

DocketFile Type: Settlement Conference Statement; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CROSS, TERRY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2019

DocketFile Type: Settlement Conference Statement; Filed By: DEFENDANT - SHELDON, LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/18/2019
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Order Granting Motion; Comment: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff s Motion to Quash Defendant's Subpoenas, is GRANTED. The Court finds that the parties previously stipulated to continue trial to May 13,2019, and the court ruled that the new trial date would govem all related deadlines, including those governing expert discovery. Accordingly, pursuant to the current trial date and the 50-day time period delineated in section 2034.230 of the Code of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff has until Monday, March2s,2019, to exchange expert information by operation of law.Based upon the above findings, and the findings in the Minute Order attached hereto as Exhibit A, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Plaintiffs Motion to Quash Defendant's Subpoenas, is GRANTED.; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CROSS, TERRY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/12/2019
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Declaration; Comment: Declaration of Ellery Gordon In Support of The Concurrently Filed Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Defendant's Subpoenas; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CROSS, TERRY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
103 More Docket Entries
07/11/2017
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Case Management Statement; Filed By: DEFENDANT - SHELDON, LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2017
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Notice; Comment: of Change of Firm Address; Filed By: DEFENDANT - SHELDON, LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2017
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees; Comment: Notice of Jury Fees Deposit; Filed By: DEFENDANT - SHELDON, LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2017
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Answer to Complaint; Comment: Answer to Unverified Complaint; Filed By: DEFENDANT - SHELDON, LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2017
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Proof of Service; Comment: As to Sheldon, LLC. Sub service.; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CROSS, TERRY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2017
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/07/2017

DocketFile Type: Rejection/Correction Notice; Comment: SUMMONS DOES NOT CONFORM TO COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/07/2017
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 5/23/2017Hearing Time: 8:30 AMHearing Department/Division: 11

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/07/2017
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/07/2017
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CROSS, TERRY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less