This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 23:59:43 (UTC).

CROSNO CONSTRUCTION VS CLARK BROTHERS

Case Summary

On 04/23/2015 CROSNO CONSTRUCTION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CLARK BROTHERS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R. and Brumfield, Lorna H.. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4661

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Brumfield, Lorna H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CROSNO CONSTRUCTION, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

CLARK BROTHERS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

NORTH EDWARDS WATER DISTRICT, A PUBLIC ENTITY

TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA, A CONNECTICUT CORPORATION

CLARK BROS., INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HODGES, JOHN F

1091 Highland Way #D

Grover Beach, CA 93433

Defendant Attorneys

BRUNET, LEON A

DUNN, JONATHAN J

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

08/06/2015 - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CRC 3.110: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: HODGES, JOHN F; Defendant; Attorney: BRUNET, LEON A

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2015
  • DocketReceipt for Records Returned - Comment: Received From: Anita Johnson CIVDS 1511273

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: Case will likely transfer to San Bernardino County on calendar for tracking purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Venue - Change of Venue Before Trial (CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • DocketNotice of Transfer of Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: FILED BY LEON A BRUNET, ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: FILED BY JONATHAN J. DUNN, ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • DocketStipulation and Order - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Comment: Case Numbers S-1500-CV-284199; S-1500-CV-284661 and BCV-15-100503 are Transfered to San Bernardino County. Cases will be consolidated in San Bernardino County. ***JUDGE LORNA H. BRUMFIELD***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: TO: JONATHAN DUNN RE: "COPY" OF STIPULATION AND ORDER TO TRANSFER RELATED CASES TO SAN BERNARDINO SUPERIOR COURT (WHERE THEY WILL BE CONSOLIDATED IN ORDER TO PERFORM TRANSFER, THE FOLLWING ARE NEEDED: (1) THREE CERTIFIED COPIES OF STIPULATION AND ORDER EXECUTED BY SAN BERNARDINO SUPERIOR COURT ON 10-15-15 ..ONE FOR EACH CASE WITH KERN COUNTY. (2) THREE SEPARATE CHECKS IN THE AMOUNT OF $50.00 TRANSFER FEE PAYABLE TO THE KERN COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT .ONE FOR EACH CASE WITH KERN COUNTY. (3) THREE SEPARATE CHECKS IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00 PAYABLE TO THE SAN BERNARDINO SUPERIOR COURT FOR ISSUANCE OF NEW CASE NUMBERS WITH SAID COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • Docket4153 Case Management Conference - Comment: Hearing Entered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • DocketOrder to Appear - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: ORDER TO APPEAR AS TO PLAINTIFF COUNSEL JOHN F HODGES RE: IMPOSITION OF $250 FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT OSC - CRC 3.110, FAILURE TO FILE CERTIFICATE OF PROGRESS AND FAILURE TO FOLLOW RULES OF COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - 08/06/2015 - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CRC 3.110: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to North Edwards Water District by personal service. Filed by John F, Hodges.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to Clark Brothers, Inc. by mail and acknowledgment of receipt of service. Filed by John F. Hodges.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACTIVE LEGAL BIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • Docket800Q Pmt: New Suit - Unlimited Civil GC 70611 (8/6/12) - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for CROSNO CONSTRUCTION, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORA... (PL-1). Received from ACTIVE LEGAL, check no(s) 6766. Receipt #836324 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: TO: JOHN F. HODGES RETURNED VIA ACTIVE LEGAL RE: CROSNO CONSTRUCTION, INC., A C Case No. S-1500-CV-284661, DRL NOTICE OF REJECTION / REQUEST FOR CORRECTIONS X The attached SUMMONS papers are being returned for the following reason(s): X Summons does not conform to Complaint / Cross-Complaint. _ ANY CORRESPONDENCE REQUIRING AN ANSWER FROM THE COURT MUST BE ACCOMPANIED BY A STAMPED, SELF ADDRESSED ENVELOPE. Calendar Notes: TO: JOHN F. HODGES RETURNED VIA ACTIVE LEGAL RE: CROSNO CONSTRUCTION, INC., A C Case No. S-1500-CV-284661, DRL NOTICE OF REJECTION / REQUEST FOR CORRECTIONS X The attached SUMMONS papers are being returned for the following reason(s): X Summons does not conform to Complaint / Cross-Complaint. _ ANY CORRESPONDENCE REQUIRING AN ANSWER FROM THE COURT MUST BE ACCOMPANIED BY A STAMPED, SELF ADDRESSED ENVELOPE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Aug 06, 2015 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_11 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Aug 06, 2015 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_11 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2015
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • DocketComplaint - Fast Track - Comment: FILED BY JOHN F HODGES ESQ. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 10/20/15 AT 8:30AM DEPT 11 RETURNED VIA ACTIVE LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: FILED BY JOHN F. HUGHES

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORTH EDWARDS WATER DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where CLARK BROS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where TRAVELERS CASUALTY & SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRUNET, LEON A