This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 21:08:50 (UTC).

CRISTINA VALDOVINOS, ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND ALL CURRENT AND FORMER AGGRIEVED EMPLOYEES PURSUANT TO THE LABOR CODE PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL ACT OF 2004, LABOR CODE 2698 ET SEQ VS WESTERN DENTAL SERVICES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 CRISTINA VALDOVINOS, ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND ALL CURRENT AND FORMER AGGRIEVED EMPLOYEES PURSUANT TO THE LABOR CODE PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL ACT OF 2004, LABOR CODE 2698 ET SEQ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against WESTERN DENTAL SERVICES, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Schuett, Stephen D. and Lampe, David R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2281

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Schuett, Stephen D.

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CRISTINA VALDOVINOS, ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND ALL CURRENT AND FORMER AGGRIEVED EMPLOYEES PURSUANT TO THE LABOR CODE PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL ACT OF 2004, LABOR CODE 2698 ET SEQ

Defendants

WESTERN DENTAL SERVICES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

WESTERN DENTAL SERVICES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KATOFSKY, ALEX P

GAINES, DANIEL F

GAINES, KENNETH S

GAINES, EVAN S.

Defendant Attorney

BARRITT, DOUGLAS A

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: re: Notice of Entry of Order - All consolidated case numbers must be listed CRC 3.350(d)

Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

SDS Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference/Final Case Management Conference/Trial (N1):

Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

SDS Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference/Final Case Management Conference/Trial (N1):

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 03/12/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Trial; Comment: CONT * 01/09/19 Status of Consolidation; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: GAINES, EVAN S.; Defendant; Attorney: BARRITT, DOUGLAS A

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: re: CMC Statement & Notice to Appear by Telephone - This matter is consolidated - all case numbers must be listed - CRC 3.350(d)

Further Case Management Conference

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Comment: RELATED CASE FCS049783 (SOLANO COUNTY - TRANSFER IN )

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 10/31/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: Cont: 08/29/18 Related case: FCS049783 (SOLANO COUNTY CASE)

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 08/29/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: continued from 05/31/2018 * Jury Fees not posted by Deft *

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 05/31/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: cont 03/28/18; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: KATOFSKY, ALEX P; Defendant; Attorney: BARRITT, DOUGLAS A

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 03/28/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 1/12/2018 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:10

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: T/E: 5 days PLTF. Jury - Cont'd per Stip 10/29/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Comment: TRJ- 03/23/20 - Cont'd per Stip 10/29/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Comment: FCMC 3/13/20, JT 3/23/20 T/E 5 Days- Cont'd per Stip 10/29/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment / Adjudication - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: 1/31/2020; 2/5/2020 amended notice Plaintiff, CRISTINA VALDOVINOS; DJESHARIYA MAULL Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication ResID: 37004 Hearing continued per standing order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: 2/3/2020 Defendant, WESTERN DENTAL SERVICES, INC. Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication of Issues ResID: 37003 Hearing continued per standing order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketAmended Notice - Comment: Amended Notice of Plaintiffs' Consolidated Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication Hearing Date: 4/22/2020 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketAmended Notice - Comment: [Western Dental Services, Inc.'s] of Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative Summary Adjudication of Issues Hearing Date: 4/22/2020 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketEvidence in Support of - Comment: Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication of Issues

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketSeparate Statement of Undisputed Facts - Comment: in support of Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication of Issues

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketPoints and Authorities - Comment: in support of Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication of Issues

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry - Comment: Notice of Entry of stipulation and order.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint - Comment: First Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • DocketStipulation and Order - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Comment: FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ***GRANTED***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: AS TO WESTERN DENTAL SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 1/12/2018 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Summons RETURNED VIA E-FILE

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.