This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/08/2021 at 16:20:10 (UTC).

CRIST ET AL VS GREYHOUND LINES, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/16/2020 CRIST filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GREYHOUND LINES, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lampe, David R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1648

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LOPEZ, EFRAIN ZABALETA, Sr.

FOY, YASHIRAH

CRIST, SARAH

GRABBAN, MARK

BATEMAN, AARON

Defendants

GREYHOUND LINES, INC.

FIRST GROUP AMERICAN, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBBINS, CLAY, III

Defendant Attorney

CHERMELA, JASON R

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 10/29/20 Hearing Time: 8:30 Hearing Department/Division: 11

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Cont'd from 1/12/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketAudio streaming announced.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Case Management Conference 01/12/2021: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketAnswer to First Amended Complaint - Comment: Answer to First Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: First Amended Complaint. As to First Group America Inc. Personal service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: First Amended Complaint. As to Greyhound Lines, Inc. Personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Summons (First Amended Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Greyhound Lines, Inc. via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to First Group America, Inc. via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case(s) - Comment: BCV-20-101510

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 07/21/20201:13 PM; Served: 07/21/20202:45 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 10/29/20 Hearing Time: 8:30 Hearing Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIRST GROUP AMERICA, INC., A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Greyhound Lines, Inc. is a litigant