This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/13/2018 at 18:18:09 (UTC).

CREDITORS SPECIALTY SERVICE, INC. VS BULLARD

Case Summary

On 03/27/2013 CREDITORS SPECIALTY SERVICE, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BULLARD. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6206

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDITORS SPECIALTY SERVICE, INC.

Defendant

BULLARD, MELODY J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EVANS, NEIL C

32023 Crown Valley Rd

Acton, CA 93510

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2014
  • Judgment - Comment: SIGNED BY COMMISSIONER ETIENNE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2014
  • NP1711 - Comment: Department: 12 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: COURT TRIAL/CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DISPOSED AFTER COURT TRIAL, AFTER EVIDENCE BY BOTH SIDES (STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY). THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: DENNIS BERRY MAKES A SPECIAL APPEARANCE FOR NEIL C EVANS ON BEHALF OF CREDITORS SPECIALTY SERVICE, INC. (PL-1). MELODY J BULLARD (DE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. *************************************************************************************** COURT AND COUNSEL DISCUSS PRE-TRIAL STIPULATIONS CAUSE SUBMITTED ON THE PLEADINGS. PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL WAIVES OPENING STATEMENT. DEFENDANT DEFERRERS OPENING STATEMENT. MICHAEL RAY DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES ON BEHALF OF THE PLAINTIFF. EVIDENCE PRESENTED BY PLAINTIFF. DEFENDANT IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. EVIDENCE PRESENTED BY DEFENSE. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT AGAINST PLAINTIFF. DEFENDANT TO PREPARE JUDGMENT FOR SIGNATURE. EXHIBIT LIST ATTACHED AND MADE A PART HEREOF. EXHIBIT'S RETURNED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2014
  • 4147 Court Trial/Final Case Management Conference - Comment: Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: T/E: 2HOURS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2014
  • Court Trial - Original Type: Court Trial; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: CONV; Comment: T/E: 2HOURS; Parties Present Plaintiff: CREDITORS SPECIALTY SERVICE, INC.; Defendant: BULLARD, MELODY J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: TO: MELODY J. BULLARD PRO PER UNDER "B" 9806 AUTUMN SERENADE CT. BAKERSFIELD, CA 93312 RE: CREDITORS SPECIALTY SERVICE, I Case No. S-1500-CL-276206, LSE NOTICE OF REJECTION / REQUEST FOR CORRECTIONS _X_ The attached _SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT_ papers are being returned for the following reason(s): _X_ Other: ___NO SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR THE DATE LISTED____. ANY CORRESPONDENCE REQUIRING AN ANSWER FROM THE COURT MUST BE ACCOMPANIED BY A STAMPED, SELF ADDRESSED ENVELOPE. Calendar Notes: TO: MELODY J. BULLARD PRO PER UNDER "B" 9806 AUTUMN SERENADE CT. BAKERSFIELD, CA 93312 RE: CREDITORS SPECIALTY SERVICE, I Case No. S-1500-CL-276206, LSE NOTICE OF REJECTION / REQUEST FOR CORRECTIONS _X_ The attached _SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT_ papers are being returned for the following reason(s): _X_ Other: ___NO SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR THE DATE LISTED____. ANY CORRESPONDENCE REQUIRING AN ANSWER FROM THE COURT MUST BE ACCOMPANIED BY A STAMPED, SELF ADDRESSED ENVELOPE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2014
  • Case Management Conference - Original Type: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2013
  • Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf - Comment: NOTICE OF FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE / TRIAL o TIME ESTIMATE 2 HOURS. o CAUSE SET FOR FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 4/17/2014 AT 09:00A.M. IN SUPERIOR COURT DEPARTMENT 12, 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301, BEFORE THE HONORABLE LINDA S. ETIENNE (see pretrial rules on next page). o CAUSE SET FOR TRIAL ON 4/17/2014 AT 09:00A.M. IN SUPERIOR COURT, DEPARTMENT 12, 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301, BEFORE THE HONORABLE LINDA S. ETIENNE. YOUR ATTENTION IS DIRECTED TO THE ATTACHED SPECIAL RULES RELATING TO SETTLEMENT CONFERENCES AND THE CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.1380. DUTY OF ATTORNEYS AS TO SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: EXCEPT AS OTHERWISE DIRECTED BY THE COURT FOR GOOD CAUSE SHOWN, ALL PARTIES, THEIR ATTORNEYS AND, WHEN A PARTY IS INSURED, A REPRESENTATIVE OF THE INSURANCE COMPANY WHO HAS THE AUTHORITY TO SETTLE SUCH CASE, SHALL ATTEND THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE / TRIAL o TIME ESTIMATE 2 HOURS. o CAUSE SET FOR FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 4/17/2014 AT 09:00A.M. IN SUPERIOR COURT DEPARTMENT 12, 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301, BEFORE THE HONORABLE LINDA S. ETIENNE (see pretrial rules on next page). o CAUSE SET FOR TRIAL ON 4/17/2014 AT 09:00A.M. IN SUPERIOR COURT, DEPARTMENT 12, 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301, BEFORE THE HONORABLE LINDA S. ETIENNE. YOUR ATTENTION IS DIRECTED TO THE ATTACHED SPECIAL RULES RELATING TO SETTLEMENT CONFERENCES AND THE CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.1380. DUTY OF ATTORNEYS AS TO SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: EXCEPT AS OTHERWISE DIRECTED BY THE COURT FOR GOOD CAUSE SHOWN, ALL PARTIES, THEIR ATTORNEYS AND, WHEN A PARTY IS INSURED, A REPRESENTATIVE OF THE INSURANCE COMPANY WHO HAS THE AUTHORITY TO SETTLE SUCH CASE, SHALL ATTEND THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2013
  • NP1430 - Comment: Department: 12 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. HEARING BEFORE TRIAL. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: MICHAEL PARENT MAKES A SPECIAL APPEARANCE FOR NEIL C EVANS ON BEHALF OF CREDITORS SPECIALTY SERVICE, INC. (PL-1). MELODY J BULLARD (DE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. *************************************************************************************** PARTIES/COUNSEL STIPULATE TO COMMISSIONER ACTING AS JUDGE PRO TEMPORE OF THE SUPERIOR COURT. ALL PARTIES REQUESTS A COURT TRIAL IN THIS MATTER. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: COURT TRIAL/FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET ON 4/17/2014 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 12. TIME ESTIMATE: 2 HOURS. NOTICE TO ISSUE FROM THE COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2013
  • 4153 Case Management Conference - Comment: Hearing Entered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2013
  • Case Management Conference - Original Type: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: CONV; Comment: Parties Present Plaintiff: CREDITORS SPECIALTY SERVICE, INC.; Defendant: BULLARD, MELODY J

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2013
  • 845V Pmt: Ltd Civil First Appearance < $25,000 GC 70614(A) - Comment: Amount of $370.00 for BULLARD, MELODY J (DE-1). Received from MELODY J BULLARD, check no(s) 1024. Receipt #721409 for amount of $370.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2013
  • Hearing Vacated - Comment: 7/10/13 OSC VACATED POS FILED ~ calid=2206694 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4159, CourtDate:07/10/2013, Courtroom:12, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:0, SessionType:OSC, Judge:LSE, Deputy:ryanb, SystemDate:3/29/2013 3:31:28 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • Proof of Service - Comment: AS TO MELODY J BULLARD PERSONAL SERVICE 5/10/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • 844L Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint > $10,000 GC 70613(A) - Comment: Amount of $370.00 for CREDITORS SPECIALTY SERVICE, INC. (PL-1). Received from CREDITORS SPECIALTY SERVICE OF, check no(s) 4106. Receipt #709869 for amount of $370.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA SELF ADDRESSED ENVELOPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jul 10, 2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jul 10, 2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • CONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 819

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Declaration - Comment: OF VENUE FILED BY NEIL C EVANS, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: FILED BY NEIL C EVANS, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY NEIL C EVANS, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less