This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 06/04/2023 at 09:37:15 (UTC).

CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC., ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK VS AMADORMARTINEZ

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC , ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AMADORMARTINEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0094

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC., ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

AMADORMARTINEZ, JUAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BYRON KADEN D.

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued and Filed

11/23/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Statement of Classification and Location

11/23/2022: Statement of Classification and Location

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

11/23/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Complaint

11/23/2022: Complaint

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

11/28/2022: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

11/28/2022: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

12/16/2022: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f); Dept.: Lamont Division B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC., ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC., ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Statement of Classification and Location; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC., ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC., ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC., ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less