This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 11:40:23 (UTC).

CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION VS WARE

Case Summary

On 10/30/2015 CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WARE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr., Stainfield, Bryan K. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0183

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION

Defendants

WARE, ANTHONY

WARE, ANTHONY W

WARE, ANTHONY WAYNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOALST, LAURA M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketWrit Returned Partially Satisfied Pursuant to CCP 263.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: KERN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • DocketWrit Returned Unsatisfied Pursuant to CCP 263.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: SACRAMENTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs and Credits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer(s): Stainfield, Bryan K., Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION; Awarded Against: WARE, ANTHONY; Amount; Damages: $4,831.05; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 20.04 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $2,339.95; Attorney Fees: $963.92; Costs: $350.00; Total: $8484.92; Party: Names: CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION; WARE, ANTHONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Plantiff's Application and Declaration to Allow Copies in Lieu of Original Contract in Support of Default Judgement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: In Support of Judgement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: RE: Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: Plantiff's Memorandum in Support o Default Judgement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: DOES 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.