This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:46:35 (UTC).

CRAMER VS MCMAHON, Doctor of Dental Sur ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/11/2017 CRAMER filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against MCMAHON, Doctor of Dental Sur. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R. and Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2384

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CRAMER, MARY ANN

Defendants

MICHAEL B. MCMAHON, D.D.S., INC.

MCMAHON, MICHAEL B, Doctor of Dental Sur

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVIS, STEVEN D

Defendant Attorney

SILLIS, JOHN J

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling 11/20/2019: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further

Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further 11/19/2019: Judicial Officer(s): Friedman, Gary T., Friedman - Retired, Gary T.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CONTINUED FROM 10/11

Ruling

Ruling 10/24/2019: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further

Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further 10/11/2019: Judicial Officer(s): Friedman, Gary T., Friedman - Retired, Gary T.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CONTINUED FROM 6/26/19

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 06/26/2019: Judicial Officer(s): Friedman, Gary T., Friedman - Retired, Gary T.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: J/T & FSC SET 3/25/19 9AM DEPT 11 T/E 8 DAYS

Ruling

Ruling 06/19/2019: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Ruling 04/09/2019: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Ruling 02/08/2019: Hearing Time: 11:30 AM; Result: Ruling; Comment: Re-assigning case to Judge Thomas S Clark for all purposes

Ruling

Ruling 02/08/2019: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Ruling 12/11/2018: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 1/25/2018 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:11

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: Pursuant to CRC 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal - Comment: and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: with prejudice As to Entire case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed; Comment: T/E 8 DAYS JURY FOR PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Unconditional

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 11/20/2019: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: Consent of parties or their lawyers to confer separately with settlement conference judge pro tem ret. Gary T. Friedman in department 1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Further - Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further 11/19/2019: Judicial Officer(s): Friedman, Gary T., Friedman - Retired, Gary T.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CONTINUED FROM 10/11

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO MICHAEL B MCMAHON, PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO MICHAEL B MCMAHON,DDS, PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 1/25/2018 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: summons RETURNED VIA E-FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 12/12/2017; Served: 12/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less