This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 04:46:06 (UTC).

CRAIN VS LLANOS

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 CRAIN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LLANOS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Taft / Maricopa Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Phillips, Craig G.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0036

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Taft / Maricopa Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Phillips, Craig G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CRAIN, JOHN

Defendant

LLANOS, LORENA

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

MO-ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Dismissed; Comment: Continued from 10/8/15

Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

MO- ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 10/8/2015: Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Reset; Comment: Re: Dismissal No Proof of Service Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2015
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Before Court Trial; Party: Names: CRAIN, JOHN; LLANOS, LORENA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • DocketDismissed Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - MO-ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Dismissed; Comment: Continued from 10/8/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - MO- ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 10/8/2015: Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Reset; Comment: Re: Dismissal No Proof of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: as to Any and All Occupants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: CRAIN, JOHN; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 4237 DECATOR FRAZIER PARK, CA 93225 KERN COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Returned via Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less