This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 04:05:43 (UTC).

CRAIG TOMKINS ET AL VS FCA US LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/05/2016 CRAIG TOMKINS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark, Thomas S., Brumfield, Lorna H., Lampe, David R., Schuett, Stephen D. and Friedman - Retired, Gary T.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1526

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Clark, Thomas S.

Brumfield, Lorna H.

Lampe, David R.

Schuett, Stephen D.

Friedman - Retired, Gary T.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TOMKINS, CRAIG G.

MARTIN, JAMIE M.

Defendants

FCA US LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

CJM AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA BAKERSFIELD CHRYSLER JEEP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MIKHOV, STEVE B

UNGS, LAUREN A

WIRTZ, RICHARD M

Defendant Attorneys

SHEPARDSON, SCOTT S.

SCHIRM, BARRY RAYMOND

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling 01/09/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 02:30 PM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Ruling 01/03/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 03:30 PM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Ruling 12/27/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Ruling 12/12/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 03:30 PM; Result: Ruling

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 12/01/2017: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: FCMC 08/18/17; JURY TRIAL 09/05/17; T/E 10-12 DAYS; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: WIRTZ, RICHARD M; Plaintiff; Attorney: WIRTZ, RICHARD M

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition 12/01/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: FILED 11/30/17 MOVING PARTY; DEFENDANTS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO COMPEL INSPECTION OF VEHICLE AND PLAINTIFFS DEPOSITION

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition)

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) 06/16/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: to show cause why the court should not consolidate (1) BCV-16-102907 DR (2) BCV-16-102487 TSC (3) BCV-16-101526 TSC (4) BCV-16-100877 DRL (5) BCV-16-101360 TSC (6) BCV-16-101473 DRL for discovery and case management purposes including the appointment of a discovery referee for all cases

Ruling

Minute Order Dated 5-16-17: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Case Management Conference

**MO -cmc Public: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held

Motion for Fees (Post-Disposition)

Motion for Fees (Post-Disposition) 08/30/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 7/31/19 Plaintiffs, CRAIG TOMKINS; JAMIE M. MARTIN Motion for Attorney's Fees, Costs and Expenses ResID: 35476

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: $20 fee is required. Please select filing code Declaration and order ($20 fee). Returned via efile

Ruling

Ruling 06/28/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 03:30 PM; Result: Ruling

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 04/11/2019: Judicial Officer(s): Friedman, Gary T., Friedman - Retired, Gary T.; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: FCMC/ Jury Trial 05/06/2019 (17) T/E 7-8 days

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 01/04/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Notice of change of address rejected: Per conversation with Eugena, Please add attorney of record Lauren Ungs to the cover page. Returned via efile

Motion to Augment

Motion to Augment 09/27/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 8/29/18 Plaintiffs, CRAIG TOMKINS; JAMIE M MARTIN Motion to Augment Expert Witness Designation ResID: 32830

Trial Setting Conference

Trial Setting Conference 01/30/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held

Ruling

Ruling 06/29/2017: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling; Comment: ruling on matter submitted on 06/16/17

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: With Prejudice As to Entire Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketJudgment After Hearing - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Comment: on Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Express; see order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Declaration and order rejected: Duplicate filing. Returned via efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketDeclaration and Order - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Comment: of AMy Morse re Status of settlement in anticipatin of OSC re Dismissal hearing; Having read the declaration, the Court makes the following orders: 1. The hearing on the Order to Show Case re: Dismissal has been continued to May 6, 2019. OSC RE:setfor 12/12/2019, at 8:30 a.m., in Dept. 17 IT IS SO ORDERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To continue a hearing requires judicial approval and fee of $20. Re-submit with a proposed order and filing fee. Returned via efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 09/11/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Fees (Post-Disposition) - Motion for Fees (Post-Disposition) 08/30/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 7/31/19 Plaintiffs, CRAIG TOMKINS; JAMIE M. MARTIN Motion for Attorney's Fees, Costs and Expenses ResID: 35476

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketErrata - Comment: Notice of Errata to Declaration of Steve Mikhov in Support of Reply Brief

    Read MoreRead Less
168 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2016
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: FILED BY SCOTT S. SHEPARDSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: FILED BY SCOTT S. SHEPARDSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO CJM AUTOMOTIVE GROUP,INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO FCA US LLC, PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • DocketService Copy / Coordination Proceeding

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 10/19/16 Hearing Time: 08:30 Hearing Department/Division:17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 07/08/2016; Served: 07/08/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less