This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:27:28 (UTC).

COX VS COX, II

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 COX filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against COX, II. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stainfield, Bryan K., Bittleston, Dawn and Gill, Susan M.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4157

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Bittleston, Dawn

Gill, Susan M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COX, JANA MARIE

Respondent

COX, MICHAEL STERLING, II

 

Court Documents

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 12/14/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: COX, JANA MARIE; Respondent: COX, MICHAEL STERLING, II

Hearing on Waiver of Fees

Hearing on Waiver of Fees 12/01/2017: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET FW FEES: $435.00 CONT 11/03/17; Parties Present Petitioner: COX, JANA MARIE

Hearing on Waiver of Fees

Original Type: Hearing on Waiver of Fees; Hearing on Waiver of Fees 11/03/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: PET FW FEES: $435.00; Parties Present Petitioner: COX, JANA MARIE

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2018
  • DocketEx Parte Application and Order to Restore Name - Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Comment: SIGNED PURSUANT TO C.C.P 635

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Court Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • DocketMediated Agreement - Settlement of Issues

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Mandatory Settlement Conference 12/14/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketRevenue Recovery Document-Agreement to Satisfy Court - Comment: Ordered Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing - Denied / Payment - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Comment: Arrangement TOTAL FEES $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing on Waiver of Fees - Hearing on Waiver of Fees 12/01/2017: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET FW FEES: $435.00 CONT 11/03/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • DocketRevenue Recovery Financial Evaluation Recommendation

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2017
  • DocketAt-Issue Memorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketNotice/Request for Demand of Production of Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketResponse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Hearing Ordered - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Comment: PET $435

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less