This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 22:52:45 (UTC).

COVINGTON SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY VS CRYSTAL O. MARTINEZ DBA TWENTY ONE CLUB AND LOUNGE ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/20/2017 COVINGTON SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CRYSTAL O MARTINEZ DBA TWENTY ONE CLUB AND LOUNGE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S. and Robertson, Murray J.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1526

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Robertson, Murray J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COVINGTON SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

HENEER ROBINSON ROSAS DBA TWENTY ONE CLUB AND LOUNGE

MINERVA LAURENT DBA TWENTY ONE CLUB AND LOUNGE

CRYSTAL O. MARTINEZ DBA TWENTY ONE CLUB AND LOUNGE

HENERR ROBINSON ROSAS DBA TWENTY ONE CLUB AND LOUNGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GABA, RUDOLFO

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) 02/27/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) 01/24/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd from 09/20/17 and 11/22/17

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) 11/22/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd from 09/20/17

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) 09/20/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketWrit Returned Partially Satisfied Pursuant to CCP 263.6 - Comment: re Writ Issued 07/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Full Satisfaction - Comment: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: County of Los Angeles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketAbstract Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: Cont'd from 02/27/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: COVINGTON SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY; Awarded Against: MINERVA LAURENT DBA TWENTY ONE CLUB AND LOUNGE; HENERR ROBINSON ROSAS DBA TWENTY ONE CLUB AND LOUNGE; Amount; Damages: $11,141.47; Pre-Judgment Interest: $2,754.15; Attorney Fees: $0.00; Costs: $528.00; Total: $14423.62; Party: Names: COVINGTON SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY; MINERVA LAURENT DBA TWENTY ONE CLUB AND LOUNGE; HENERR ROBINSON ROSAS DBA TWENTY ONE CLUB AND LOUNGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: as to Covington Specialty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed; Comment: Cont'd from 09/20/17, 11/22/17 and 01/24/18

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2017
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint - Comment: ***Etienne*** True Name: Henerr Robinson Rosas dba Twenty One Club and Lounge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: As to Minerva Laurent dba Twenty One Club and Lounge. 1 attempt.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: As to Crystal O. Martinez. 1 attempt.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: As to Heneer Robinson Rosas dba Twenty One Club and Lounge. 1 attempt.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved; Served: 11/21/2017; Served: 11/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.