This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 11/30/2021 at 08:56:04 (UTC).

COUNTY OF TULARE VS SANCHEZ

Case Summary

On 08/04/2021 COUNTY OF TULARE filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against SANCHEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bittleston, Dawn and Loo, Cynthia L.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5222

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bittleston, Dawn

Loo, Cynthia L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COUNTY OF TULARE

Respondent

SANCHEZ, JOSE

 

Court Documents

DCSS - Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: NOTICE REGARDING PAYMENT OF SUPPORT ENV #7111188

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketMotion - DCSS (Modification) - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 09/01/2021 DCSS NOM MOD CS HC STND ORDERS 3 MINORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketRequest for Interpreter - Comment: SPANISH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketDCSS: Proof of Service by Mail - Comment: E-FILED BY KERN COUNTY DCSS, NOM HRG: 11/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Motion - Modification (DCSS) - Comment: Re: DCSS NOM MOD CS HC STND ORDERS 3 MINORS Hearing Date: 11/18/2021 Hearing Time: 8:00 AM Hearing Department/Division: A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketNotice Re Payment of Support - Comment: E-FILED BY KERN COUNTY DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDCSS - Electronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: NOTICE REGARDING PAYMENT OF SUPPORT ENV #7111188

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Registration of California Support Order - Comment: E-FILED BY DCSS KERN COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketDCSS: Statement for Registration of CA Support Order - Comment: E-FILED BY DCSS KERN COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COUNTY OF TULARE is a litigant