This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 10/12/2021 at 07:24:28 (UTC).

COUNTY OF TULARE VS HAMPTON

Case Summary

On 07/14/2021 COUNTY OF TULARE filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against HAMPTON. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Bittleston, Dawn. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5208

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Bittleston, Dawn

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COUNTY OF TULARE

Respondent

HAMPTON, TYRONE DAVIE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketMotion - DCSS (Modification) - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Comment: 11/09/21 DCSS NOM MOD CS HC STND ORDR 2 MINORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketDCSS: Proof of Service by Mail - Comment: E-FILED BY KERN COUNTY DCSS, NOM HRG: 11/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Motion - Modification (DCSS) - Comment: E-FILED BY DCSS Re: DCSS NOM MOD CS HC STND ORDR 2 MINORS Hearing Date: 11/09/21 Hearing Time: 08:00AM Hearing Department/Division: A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketNotice Re Payment of Support - Comment: E-FILED BY KERN COUNTY DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Registration of California Support Order - Comment: E-FILED BY DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketDCSS: Statement for Registration of CA Support Order - Comment: E-FILED BY DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COUNTY OF TULARE is a litigant