This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 11/19/2022 at 15:45:09 (UTC).

COUNTY OF KERN VS HOBBS

Case Summary

On 09/16/2022 COUNTY OF KERN filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against HOBBS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division Justice Building located in Kern, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2219

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COUNTY OF KERN

Respondent

HOBBS, TYREESE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SCHROER JEFFREY S.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Motion (DCSS); Dept.: Bakersfield Division A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketFile Type: DCSS: Proof of Service by Mail; Comment: NOM HRG 01/09/2023; Filed By: PETITIONER - COUNTY OF KERN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Motion - Initial DCSS; Comment: Re: 10/24/22 DCSS NOM JDG C/S H/C PARENTAGE STNRD ORDERS 1 MINORHearing Date: 01/09/23Hearing Time: 8:00 AM Hearing Department/Division: A; Filed By: PETITIONER - COUNTY OF KERN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Answer to Complaint; Comment: FILED BY DCSS; Filed By: RESPONDENT - HOBBS, TYREESE J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Summons & Complaint / Parental Obligations; Filed By: PETITIONER - COUNTY OF KERN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHROER, JEFFREY S.