This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/28/2020 at 23:41:21 (UTC).

COUNTY OF KERN VS EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/08/2013 COUNTY OF KERN filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R. and Friedman, Gary T.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0031

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Friedman, Gary T.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COUNTY OF KERN

Defendant

EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

POLLAK, MICHAEL M

Attorney at POLLAK VIDA & FISHER

11150 W Olympic Blvd #980

Los Angeles, CA 900641839

Defendant Attorneys

PELVIN, MARK D

MEWERS, QUEENA

 

Court Documents

Ruling

7/23/15 Ruling on 7/17/15 Further Hearing on Amount of Judgment: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Further Hearing - Post-Disposition

07/17/15 - Further Hearing amount of judgment as to attorney fees: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: ON ENTRY OF JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF AND AMOUNT OF JUDGMENT; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: POLLAK, MICHAEL M; Defendant; Attorney: PELVIN, MARK D; Attorney: MEWERS, QUEENA

Jury Trial

06/22/15 - FURTHER HEARING ON TRIAL BY JURY: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Trial Held After Settlement Conference; Comment: FURTHER HEARING ON TRIAL BY JURY; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: POLLAK, MICHAEL M; Defendant; Attorney: PELVIN, MARK D; Attorney: MEWERS, QUEENA

Jury Trial

06/17/2015 - FURTHER HEARING ON TRIAL BY JURY: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Trial Held After Settlement Conference; Comment: FURTHER HEARING ON TRIAL BY JURY; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: POLLAK, MICHAEL M; Defendant; Attorney: PELVIN, MARK D; Attorney: MEWERS, QUEENA

Jury Trial

06/16/15 - FURTHER HEARING ON TRIAL BY JURY: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Trial Held After Settlement Conference; Comment: Further hearing on trial by jury; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: POLLAK, MICHAEL M; Defendant; Attorney: PELVIN, MARK D; Attorney: MEWERS, QUEENA

Jury Trial

06/15/15 - FURTHER HEARING ON TRIAL BY JURY: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Trial Held After Settlement Conference; Comment: In Progress; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: POLLAK, MICHAEL M; Defendant; Attorney: PELVIN, MARK D; Attorney: MEWERS, QUEENA

Jury Trial

06/11/15 - FURTHER HEARING ON TRIAL BY JURY: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Trial Held After Settlement Conference; Comment: FURTHER HEARING ON TRIAL; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: POLLAK, MICHAEL M; Defendant; Attorney: PELVIN, MARK D; Attorney: MEWERS, QUEENA

Further Hearing - Pre-Disposition

06/10/15 - FURTHER FINAL CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: on Final Case Management Conference

Final Case Management Conference

06/09/15 - FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: POLLAK, MICHAEL M; Defendant; Attorney: PELVIN, MARK D; Attorney: MEWERS, QUEENA

Ruling

06/08/15 - RULING: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Ruling CV: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2015
  • DocketExhibit(s) List - Comment: PLAINTIFF'S/ DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • DocketLetter Received - Comment: Letter From: Mark Nations Date of Letter: 9/11/15 Re: Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Full Satisfaction - Comment: As to Everest national Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • DocketJudgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Comment: On Special Verdict.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • DocketUnder Submission Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - 7/23/15 Ruling on 7/17/15 Further Hearing on Amount of Judgment: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • DocketAppointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Comment: Court Reporter: Dawn Thompson *****David R. Lampe*****

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • DocketCase Under Submission for Decision

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFurther Hearing - Post-Disposition - 07/17/15 - Further Hearing amount of judgment as to attorney fees: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: ON ENTRY OF JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF AND AMOUNT OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • DocketReply Brief - Comment: On the Amount of Judgment; Declaration of Queena Mewers

    Read MoreRead Less
240 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2013
  • Docket199 Pmt: Advance Jury Fee (Non-Refundable) CCP 631(B) 8/6/12 - Comment: Amount of $150.00 for COUNTY OF KERN (PL-1). Received from POLLAK, VIDA & FISHER, check no(s) 48770. Receipt #748871 for amount of $150.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2013
  • DocketDeposit of Jury Fees - Comment: PLAINTIFF COUNTY OF KERN'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY MICHAEL M. POLLAK, ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2013
  • Docket801N First Appearance Unlimited Civil GC 70612 8/6/12 - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY (DE-1). Received from EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE, check no(s) 4102. Receipt #740838 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2013
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: DEFENDANT EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF COUNTY OF KERN'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • Docket800Q Pmt: New Suit - Unlimited Civil GC 70611 (8/6/12) - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for COUNTY OF KERN (PL-1). Received from POLLAK, VIDA & FISHER, check no(s) 48585. Receipt #735735 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2013
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2013
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Nov 21, 2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_11 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Nov 21, 2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_11 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2013
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 145

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2013
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: FILED BY MICHAEL M. POLLAK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2013
  • DocketComplaint - Fast Track - Comment: FILED BY MICHAEL M. POLLAK CMC 2/4/14 @ 8:30 AMD DEPT 11

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.