Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 21:11:19 (UTC).

COUNTY OF KERN VS DIAZ

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 COUNTY OF KERN filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against DIAZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McKnight, Ralph L., Jr., Bittleston, Dawn and Robertson, Murray J.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3246

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.

Bittleston, Dawn

Robertson, Murray J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COUNTY OF KERN

Respondent

DIAZ, JOSE ERICK

Not Classified By Court

CHOLICO, XENA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SCHROER, JEFFREY S.

 

Court Documents

Motion - DCSS (Modification)

Motion - DCSS (Modification) 02/10/2020: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 12/12/19 NOM MOD C/S H/C STND ORDERS 1 MINOR

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketDCSS: Findings and Order After Hearing - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Comment: HRG 2/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketState Guideline Calculation (DCSS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion - DCSS (Modification) - Motion - DCSS (Modification) 02/10/2020: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 12/12/19 NOM MOD C/S H/C STND ORDERS 1 MINOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Motion - Modification (DCSS) - Comment: 12/12/19 NOM MOD C/S H/C STND ORDERS 1 MINOR Hearing Date: 2/10/20 Hearing Time: 8:00AM Hearing Department/Division: A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • DocketStipulation and Order - Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Comment: DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • DocketMotion - DCSS (Modification) - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Stipulation/Agreement in Court (FL/DCSS); Comment: DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C STND ORDERS 1 MINOR CONTINUED FROM 4/2/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketDCSS: Stipulation to Continue and Order Thereon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketMotion - DCSS (Modification) - Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Stipulated Continuance; Comment: DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C STND ORDERS 1 MINOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketNotice of Motion - Modification (DCSS) - Comment: Re: DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C STND ORDERS 1 MINOR Hearing Date: 4/02/18 Hearing Time: 8:00 AM Hearing Department/Division: A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • DocketDCSS: Stipulation for Judgment (Non-Hearing) - Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketSummons & Complaint / Parental Obligations - Comment: E-FILED Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less