Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 21:09:25 (UTC).

COUNTY OF KERN VS CRETELLA

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 COUNTY OF KERN filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against CRETELLA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3241

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COUNTY OF KERN

Respondent

CRETELLA, SABATINO

Not Classified By Court

LEVELL, JENIFER A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SCHROER, JEFFREY S.

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: INCOME AND EXPENSE

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketDCSS: (Default)Judgment re Parental Obligations-Initial - Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketDeclaration for Default - Comment: DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default - Comment: DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: FILED BY DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: INCOME AND EXPENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketSummons & Complaint / Parental Obligations - Comment: E-FILED 1ST Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less