This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/13/2021 at 14:09:01 (UTC).

COUNTY OF KERN VS CLIFTON

Case Summary

On 06/12/2020 COUNTY OF KERN filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against CLIFTON. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Bittleston, Dawn. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2021

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Bittleston, Dawn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

COUNTY OF KERN

Defendant

CLIFTON

Respondent

CLIFTON, AARON W

Not Classified By Court

PERRY, KOURTNEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SCHROER, JEFFREY S.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketDCSS: (Default)Judgment re Parental Obligations-Initial - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Comment: E-FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketDCSS: Declaration for Default - Comment: E-FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketDCSS: Request to Enter Default - Comment: E-FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketDCSS: Proof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Acknowledgement and Receipt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketSummons & Complaint / Parental Obligations

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CLIFTON is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHROER, JEFFREY S.