Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 18:59:49 (UTC).

COUNTY OF KERN, A POLITICAL SUBDIVISION OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ET AL VS BACKYARD ORGANICS ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/07/2015 COUNTY OF KERN, A POLITICAL SUBDIVISION OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA filed an Other lawsuit against BACKYARD ORGANICS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R., Chapin, Sidney P., Brehmer, Charles R. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0446

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Chapin, Sidney P.

Brehmer, Charles R.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GREG FENTON, AS KERN COUNTY BUILDING OFFICIAL

COUNTY OF KERN, A POLITICAL SUBDIVISION OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Defendants

MORAN, RICHARD

BACKYARD ORGANICS INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Not Classified By Court

Fifth District Court of Appeal

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRANNEN, JAMES L

Defendant Attorney

DEAGUILERA, JAMES

 

Court Documents

Motion (Pre-Disposition)

MOTION AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 12/9/15 Plaintiffs, County of Kern; Greg Fenton Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Injunction ResID: 12758; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: BRANNEN, JAMES L; Plaintiff; Attorney: BRANNEN, JAMES L

Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: BRANNEN, JAMES L; Plaintiff; Attorney: BRANNEN, JAMES L

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Jury Trial - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Final Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Notice of Filing Remittitur

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Remittitur on Appeal After Dismissal - Comment: No brief having been filed by appellant(s) after notice duly given under rule 8.220(a)(1) of the California Rules of Court, IT IS ORDERED that the appeal of said appellant(s) in the above-entitled cause is dismissed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal - Comment: Dismissal Entered August 26, 2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • Order from Fifth District Court of Appeal filed - Comment: No brief having been filed by appellant(s) after notice duly given under rule 8.220(a)(1) of the California Rules of Court, IT IS ORDERED that the appeal of said appellant(s) in the above-entitled cause is dismissed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: On Complaint, entire action dimissed WITH prejudice. Endorsed copy returned via ams

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • Notice of Entry - Comment: of Order on Stipulation to Stay Matter Pending Review.

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2015
  • Answer to First Amended Complaint - Comment: Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO BACKYARD ORGANICS; SUBSTITUTED SERVICE ON 8/23/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO RICHARD MORAN; SUBSTITUTED SERVICE ON 8/23/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • Amended Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: First Amended. Returned via AMS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Without prejudice as to defendant Nathan A. Ortiz. Returned via AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • First Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 10/28/2015 Hearing Time: 8:30 A.M. Hearing Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less