This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 09/14/2021 at 07:43:12 (UTC).

COUNTY OF FRESNO VS DAVIS

Case Summary

On 05/04/2021 COUNTY OF FRESNO filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against DAVIS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Bittleston, Dawn. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5135

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Bittleston, Dawn

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COUNTY OF FRESNO

Respondent

DAVIS, JAMARI D

 

Court Documents

DCSS - Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ENV#6771885

DCSS - Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DCSS - 1ST SUPP

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketDCSS: (Default)Judgment re Parental Obligations-Supplemental - Comment: E-FILED BY DCSS 1ST SUPPLEMENTAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketDCSS: Request to Enter Default - Comment: E-FILED BY DCSS 1ST SUPPLEMENTAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketDCSS: Declaration for Default - Comment: E-FILED BY DCSS 1ST SUPPLEMENTAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketDCSS: Proof of Personal Service - Comment: E-FILED: FILED BY DCSS - 1ST SUPPLEMENTAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDCSS - Electronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ENV#6771885

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDCSS - Electronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DCSS - 1ST SUPP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketSummons & Supplemental Complaint (DCSS) - Comment: E-FILED BY KERN COUNTY DCSS 1ST SUPP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketNotice Re Payment of Support - Comment: E-FILED BY KERN COUNTY DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketStatement of Registration of California Support Order FL-650 - Comment: E-FILED BY DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COUNTY OF FRESNO is a litigant