This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/26/2020 at 11:43:12 (UTC).

CORTEZ VS CORTEZ (C)

Case Summary

On 06/25/2012 CORTEZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CORTEZ C. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Horrigan, George R., Fielder, John L., Bittleston, Dawn and Gill, Susan M.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1960

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Horrigan, George R.

Fielder, John L.

Bittleston, Dawn

Gill, Susan M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CORTEZ, GEORGE

Respondent

CORTEZ, CHRISTIAN MARIE

Minor

MINORS COUNSEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CANADAY, JIM R

Respondent Attorney

THOMPSON, FRANCIS LUTIE

Other Attorneys

KILPATRICK

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RET'D TO F.L. THOMPSON

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: FOAH RET'D TO J. R. CANADAY

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 04/10/2018: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 08/02/2017 RES MOD C/C C/V 2 MINORS CONT'D FROM 10/30/17, 11/27/17, 01/29/18; Parties Present Petitioner: CORTEZ, GEORGE; Respondent: CORTEZ, CHRISTIAN MARIE

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 01/29/2018: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 8/2/17 RES MOD C/C C/V 2 MINORS CONTD FROM 10/30/17 AND 11/27/17; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: CANADAY, JIM R; Respondent; Attorney: THOMPSON, FRANCIS LUTIE

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 11/27/2017: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 8/2/17 RES MOD C/C C/V 2 MINORS CONTD FROM 10/30/17; Parties Present Petitioner: CORTEZ, GEORGE; Attorney: CANADAY, JIM R; Respondent; Attorney: THOMPSON, FRANCIS LUTIE

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 10/30/2017: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 8/2/17 RES MOD C/C C/V 2 MINORS CONTD FROM 9/18; Parties Present Petitioner: CORTEZ, GEORGE; Attorney: CANADAY, JIM R; Respondent: CORTEZ, CHRISTIAN MARIE; Attorney: THOMPSON, FRANCIS LUTIE

Further Status Conference

Further Status Conference 10/17/2017: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 8/2/17 RES FOR MOD C/C C/V 2 MINORS CONT'D FROM 9/18/17 AND 10/03/17 **STATUS**

Further Status Conference

Further Status Conference 10/03/2017: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 8/2/17 RES FOR MOD C/C C/V 2 MINORS CONT'D FROM 9/18/17; Parties Present Respondent; Attorney: THOMPSON, FRANCIS LUTIE

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 09/18/2017: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 8/2/17 RES MOD C/C C/V 2 MINORS; Parties Present Petitioner: CORTEZ, GEORGE; Respondent: CORTEZ, CHRISTIAN MARIE; Attorney: THOMPSON, FRANCIS LUTIE

Court Trial

Court Trial 08/30/2016: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Judgment; Comment: EST TIME 1 HR; Parties Present Petitioner: CORTEZ, GEORGE

Mandatory Settlement Conference

07/14/16 MO: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: EST TIME 1 HR; Parties Present Petitioner: CORTEZ, GEORGE

Court Trial

MO - 12/16/15: Judicial Officer(s): Fielder, John L., Horrigan, George R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: CORTEZ, GEORGE

Mandatory Settlement Conference

MO 11/12/15 MSC: Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: CONTD. FROM 11/10/15

Court Trial

COURT TRIAL: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: TIME EST: 1 HR; Parties Present Petitioner: CORTEZ, GEORGE

Mandatory Settlement Conference

MSC M/O: Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: EST TIME 1HR; Parties Present Petitioner: CORTEZ, GEORGE

Request for Order - Respondent

MO - RESP RFO: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RES MOD C/V MOVE AWAY; Parties Present Petitioner: CORTEZ, GEORGE; Respondent: CORTEZ, CHRISTIAN MARIE

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketNotice - Withdrawal of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RET'D TO F.L. THOMPSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketNotice - Withdrawal of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: FOAH RET'D TO J. R. CANADAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketFindings and Orders - Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Comment: 04/10/2018 HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Respondent - Request for Order - Respondent 04/10/2018: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 08/02/2017 RES MOD C/C C/V 2 MINORS CONT'D FROM 10/30/17, 11/27/17, 01/29/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Respondent - Request for Order - Respondent 01/29/2018: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 8/2/17 RES MOD C/C C/V 2 MINORS CONTD FROM 10/30/17 AND 11/27/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketResponsive Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Respondent - Request for Order - Respondent 11/27/2017: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 8/2/17 RES MOD C/C C/V 2 MINORS CONTD FROM 10/30/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Respondent - Request for Order - Respondent 10/30/2017: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 8/2/17 RES MOD C/C C/V 2 MINORS CONTD FROM 9/18

    Read MoreRead Less
151 More Docket Entries
  • 06/27/2012
  • Docket4037 Ex Parte - Comment: Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: PET EX-PARTE C/C C/V 2MINORSTO BE HEARD IN DIV C @11AMCONTINUED FROM 6/26/12 IN DIV C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • DocketEx Parte Hearing - Original Type: Ex Parte Hearing; Judicial Officer: Master, Calendar Judge; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: CONV; Comment: PET EX-PARTE C/C C/V 2MINORSTO BE HEARD IN DIV C @11AMCONTINUED FROM 6/26/12 IN DIV C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • DocketNP1080 - Comment: Department: C Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: EX PARTE HEARING. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: GEORGE CORTEZ (PE-1) APPEARS WITH MICHAEL R KILPATRICK. CHRISTIAN MARIE CORTEZ (RE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. MATTER CONTINUED TO 06/27/2012 AT 11:00 AM IN DIV. C REASON FOR NEXT APPEARANCE: CHECK STATUS OF SHAFTER CASE #FL 61447. PARTIES ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Docket4037 Ex Parte - Comment: Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: PET EX-PARTE C/C C/V 2MINORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • DocketEx Parte Hearing - Original Type: Ex Parte Hearing; Judicial Officer: Master, Calendar Judge; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: CONV; Comment: PET EX-PARTE C/C C/V 2MINORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2012
  • DocketEx Parte Compliance - Comment: HEARING DATE:6/26/12 HEARING TIME:1100AM HEARING DIV/DEPT:MC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2012
  • DocketPetition for Legal Separation - Comment: 2MINORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2012
  • Docket172D Pmt: Motion/Stip/OSC/Demurrer GC 70617(A) - Comment: Amount of $40.00 for CORTEZ, GEORGE (PE-1). Received from KILPATRICK & WHITE, check no(s) 9089, 9090. Receipt #662115 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2012
  • Docket805K Pmt: New Suit - Family Law GC 70670(B) (10/19/10) - Comment: Amount of $395.00 for CORTEZ, GEORGE (PE-1). Received from KILPATRICK & WHITE, check no(s) 9089, 9090. Receipt #662115 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2012
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 668

    Read MoreRead Less