This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 20:35:54 (UTC).

COOPER, ET AL VS COOPER

Case Summary

On 03/28/2016 COOPER filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against COOPER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0041

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COOPER, KIM

COOPER, RICK

Defendant

COOPER, RICHARD W.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • DocketWrit Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: COOPER, RICK; COOPER, KIM; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 1028 N. SHERRI ST RIDGECREST, CA 93555; Awarded Against: COOPER, RICHARD W.; Party: Names: COOPER, RICK; COOPER, KIM; COOPER, RICHARD W.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Execution Possession or - Comment: Sale

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: DOES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: COOPER, RICK, COOPER, KIM; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less