This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/23/2022 at 22:41:03 (UTC).

CONTRERAS VS ADVENTIST HEALTH BAKERSFIELD ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 CONTRERAS filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against ADVENTIST HEALTH BAKERSFIELD. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2396

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CONTRERAS, ARTURO

Defendants

ADVENTIST HEALTH BAKERSFIELD

ADVENTIST HEALTH CARE NETWORK, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARENS, ARTHUR H

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: TO: Attorney, Arthur Barens RE: Summons REASON: does not conform to Complaint

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 01/28/2022 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: 10

Ruling

Ruling 11/22/2021: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: CONT'D FROM 01/28/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 01/28/2022: Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 11/22/2021: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 01/28/2022 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: TO: Attorney, Arthur Barens RE: Summons REASON: does not conform to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Adventist Health Care Network Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where ADVENTIST HEALTH WHITE MEMORIAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARENS ARTHUR HUGO