This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 11/21/2021 at 08:53:49 (UTC).

CONRAD VS MOBILE ESTATES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 09/22/2021 CONRAD filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MOBILE ESTATES, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark, Thomas S., Clark, Thomas S. and Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2235

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Clark, Thomas S., Clark, Thomas S.

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CONRAD, DAVID

Defendant

MOBILE ESTATES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WERBIN, ANTHONY W.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 01/07/2022 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 17

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 01/07/2022 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WERBIN ANTHONY W.