This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 04:04:03 (UTC).

CONGDON ET AL VS FORD MOTOR COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 05/24/2017 CONGDON filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FORD MOTOR COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lampe, David R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1175

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CONGDON, KATHLEEN

CONGDON, JOHN L.

Defendant

FORD MOTOR COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIKHOV, STEVE B

Defendant Attorneys

PROUDFOOT, MATTHEW M

SCOTT, JEFF E

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling 11/15/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 03:30 PM; Result: Ruling

Demurrer First Amended Complaint

Demurrer First Amended Complaint 11/13/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Continued from 11/09/17. Defendant, FORD MOTOR COMPANY Demurrer to First Amended Complaint

Demurrer First Amended Complaint

Demurrer First Amended Complaint 11/09/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: 10/5/17 Defendant, FORD MOTOR COMPANY Demurrer to First Amended Complaint ResID: 27029

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Motion and Demurrer - Documents are filed but not calendared. No Reservation.

Demurrer

Demurrer 08/04/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Filed 7/10/17, by Defendant, FORD MOTOR COMPANY. Demurrer to Complaint. ResID: 25171.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RE: Motion to Strike - Same ResID as Demurrer - Renotice Needed

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RE: Motion to Strike - Missing ResID

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RE: Demurrer - Missing ResID

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 9/6/17 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:11

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Other Clerk Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketJudgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • DocketOrder on Demurrer - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Comment: OF DEFENDANT' S TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 1. Defendant's Demurrer to all causes of action in the Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint is sustained without leave to amend. 2. Defendant's Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint is moot. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED ****JUDGE DAVID R. LAMPE****12/6/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketLetter Received - Comment: Letter From: Date of Letter: Re:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Case Management Conference 11/20/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 11/15/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 03:30 PM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RE: Demurrer - Missing ResID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • DocketNotice of Motion - Comment: Re: and Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authoritied - See Rejection - Not Calendared

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • DocketDeclaration (Meet and Confer) - Comment: of Kevin M Raya in Support of Defendant Ford Motor Company's Demurrer to Complaint RE: Meet & Confer Pursuant to CCP 430.41(a)(3)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • DocketDemurrer - Comment: Demurrer to Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities - Not Calendared - See Rejection

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: Notice of Demurrer - Not Calendared - See Rejection

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 9/6/17 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA E-FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.