This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/13/2018 at 18:19:17 (UTC).

COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC. VS TR TAE KWON DO

Case Summary

On 03/27/2013 COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TR TAE KWON DO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P. and Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6192

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC.

Defendants

TR TAE KWON DO

RIZO, ANTONIO

WILLEZ, LORI ANN

RIZO, LORI ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCORMACK, SANDRA KUHN

5330 Office Center Ct #A42

Bakersfield, CA 93309

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2017
  • Writ Returned Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • Acknowledgment of Full Satisfaction - Comment: As to Tr Tea Kwon Do; Antonio Rizzo; Lori Ann Willez aka Lori Rizo both Ind & both DBA Tr Tae Kwon Do

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2014
  • Order to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment: Calendar Notes: AS TO ANTONIO RIZO IND & DBA TR TAE KWON DO AS TO ANTONIO RIZO IND & DBA TR TAE KWON DO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2014
  • Order to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment: Calendar Notes: AS TO LORI ANN WILLEZ aka LORI RIZO IND & DBA TR TAE KWON DO AS TO LORI ANN WILLEZ aka LORI RIZO IND & DBA TR TAE KWON DO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2014
  • Hearing Vacated - Comment: AT THE REQUEST OF MOVING PARTY ~ calid=2625372 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4082, CourtDate:10/23/2014, Courtroom:12, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:19, SessionType:OSC, Judge:LSE, SystemDate:8/5/2014 3:32:15 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2014
  • Hearing Vacated - Comment: AT THE REQUEST OF MOVING PARTY ~ calid=2625380 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4082, CourtDate:10/23/2014, Courtroom:12, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:20, SessionType:OSC, Judge:LSE, SystemDate:8/5/2014 3:33:41 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2014
  • Letter Received - Comment: TO VACATE DEBTOR'S EXAM HEARINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2014
  • Declaration of Non-Service - Comment: AS TO ANTONIO RIZO DBA TR TAE KWON DO 19 ATTEMPTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2014
  • Declaration of Non-Service - Comment: AS TO LORI ANN WILLEZ AKA LORI RIZO DBA TR TAE KIWON DO 19 ATTEMPTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2014
  • Writ of Execution Issued - Comment: COUNTY OF KERN RETURNED VIA AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 05/09/2013
  • Proof of Service - Comment: AS TO TR TAE KWON DO SUB SERVED 4/30/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2013
  • Proof of Service - Comment: AS TO LORI ANN WILLEZ AKA LORI RIZO IND. AND DBA TR TAE KWON DO SUB SUB SERVED 4/30/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2013
  • Proof of Service - Comment: AS TO ANTONIO RIZO IND. AND DBA TR TAE KWON DO SUB SERVED 4/30/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • 843Y Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint < $10,000 GC 70613(B) - Comment: Amount of $225.00 for COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC. (PL-1). Received from COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC., check no(s) 22962. Receipt #709877 for amount of $225.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Mar 25, 2014 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Mar 25, 2014 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Oct 08, 2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Oct 08, 2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • CONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 819

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: FILED BY SANDRA KUHN MCCORMACK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY SANDRA KUHN MCCORMACK

    Read MoreRead Less