This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:47:26 (UTC).

COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC. VS STURGEON & SON GRADING & PAVING, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/20/2016 COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against STURGEON SON GRADING PAVING, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lampe, David R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2490

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC.

Defendants

STURGEON SERVICES INTERNATIONAL, INC.

STURGEON & SON GRADING & PAVING, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCORMACK, SANDRA KUHN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal - Comment: OF ENTIRE CASE FILED 08/22/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: With Prejudice on Entire Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: Without Prejudice as to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • Stipulation and Order - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Comment: For Conditional Dismissal and Structured Settlement. CCP 664.6 & CRC Rule 3.1385. ***JUDGE DAVID R. LAMPE*** 1-27-17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • Ruling/Certificate of Inability - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Comment: Extension Granted. Responsive Pleading due no later that February 27, 2017. ***JUDGE DAVID R. LAMPE*** 1-27-17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • Certificate of Inability to Respond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Ruling/Certificate of Inability - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Comment: Extension Granted. Responsive Pleading due no later than January 13, 2017. ***JUDGE DAVID R. LAMPE*** 12-13-16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • Certificate of Inability to Respond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO STURGEON SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO STURGEON & SON GRADING & PAVING , INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 02/03/17 Hearing Time: 08:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less