This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 01/21/2022 at 21:00:44 (UTC).

COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC. VS STORY ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/28/2021 COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against STORY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5326

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC.

Defendants

STORY, JOYCE ELIZABETH

THOMSEN, TERRI MALINDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCORMACK, SANDRA KUHN

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC-NFT (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 1/13/2022 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 12

Ruling

Ruling 01/05/2022: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC-NFT (N18C): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC-NFT (N18C): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 01/05/2022: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration of Hal Ennis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration 585b

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Without prejudice as to Does 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketRequest for Court Judgment - Comment: As to Joyce Elizabeth Story, Terri Malinda Thomsen aka Terri M Hollinger on complaint filed 9/28/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Joyce Elizabeth Story via sub service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Terri Malinda Thomsen AKA Terri M. Hollinger via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/06/202112:08 PM; Served: 10/06/202112:08 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC-NFT (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 1/13/2022 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCORMACK, SANDRA KUHN