This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 10/17/2021 at 07:20:00 (UTC).

COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC. VS SANCHEZ

Case Summary

On 07/19/2021 COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SANCHEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3967

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC.

Defendant

SANCHEZ, FRANCISCO J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCORMACK, SANDRA KUHN

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date:11/02/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:12

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Francisco J. Sanchez AKA Francisco Sanchez, JR. Ind & DBA Sanchez Trucking via sub service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 08/01/20213:09 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date:11/02/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC. is a litigant