This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 09/02/2022 at 08:46:30 (UTC).

COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC. VS P&P LOGISTICS, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/21/2022 COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against P P LOGISTICS, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2653

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC.

Defendant

P&P LOGISTICS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCORMACK SANDRA KUHN

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

06/21/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Summons Issued and Filed

06/21/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Complaint

06/21/2022: Complaint

Order to Show Cause

06/21/2022: Order to Show Cause

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

08/04/2022: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Division L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to P&P Logistics, Inc., via personal service; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 10/04/2022Hearing Time: 8:30amHearing Department/Division: L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC. is a litigant