This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 01/21/2022 at 22:48:26 (UTC).

COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC. VS KEVIN JEWELERS, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/13/2021 COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KEVIN JEWELERS, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5594

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC.

Defendants

KEVIN JEWELERS, INC.

JEWELRY EXPRESS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCORMACK, SANDRA KUHN

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 1/27/2022 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 12

Ruling

Original Type: Ruling; Ruling 12/07/2021: Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal - Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Original Type: Ruling; Ruling 12/07/2021: Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 1/27/2022 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kevin Jewelers, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where JEWELRY EXPRESS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION D/B/A KEVIN JEWELERS is a litigant

Latest cases where COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC. is a litigant