This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/13/2018 at 18:19:13 (UTC).

COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC. VS GURU NANAK MISSION OF BAKERSFIELD

Case Summary

On 03/27/2013 COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GURU NANAK MISSION OF BAKERSFIELD. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6188

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC.

Defendants

GURU NANAK MISSION OF BAKERSFIELD, INC

SINGH, GURMEET S

SINGH, KULDIP M

GREWAL, GURUSHARAN SINGH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCORMACK, SANDRA KUHN

5330 Office Center Ct #A42

Bakersfield, CA 93309

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2014
  • Abstract Issued - Comment: FILED BY: SANDRA KUHN MCCORMACK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2014
  • 117B Pmt: Abstract Issued GC 70626(A)(2) EFF 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC. (PL-1). Received from COMMERCIAL TRADE INC., check no(s) 23953. Receipt #771491 for amount of $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2014
  • Order to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2014
  • Hearing Vacated - Comment: JUDGMENT SIGNED ~ calid=2206426 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4184, CourtDate:03/25/2014, Courtroom:12, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:2, SessionType:OSC, Judge:LSE, SystemDate:3/29/2013 1:31:59 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2014
  • Judgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: AS TO GURMEET S SINGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • Certificate of Progress - Comment: FILED BY SANDRA KUHN MCCORMACK, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • Request for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: AS TO GURMEET S SINGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: AS TO GURU NANAK MISSION OF BAKERSFIELD INC ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: W/O PREJUDICE AS TO KULDIP M SINGH AKA KULDIP S STONE ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: GURUSHARON SINGH GREWAL AKA GURUSHARAN GREWAL ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 04/25/2013
  • Proof of Service - Comment: AS TO GURUSHARAN SINGH GREWAL AKA GURUSHARAN GREWAL SUB SERVED 4/21/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2013
  • Proof of Service - Comment: AS TO GURMEET S. SINGH SUB SERVED 4/21/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2013
  • Proof of Service - Comment: AS TO GURU NANK MISION OF BAKERSFIELD, INC. SUB SERVED 4/16/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • 843Y Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint < $10,000 GC 70613(B) - Comment: Amount of $225.00 for COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC. (PL-1). Received from COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC., check no(s) 22961. Receipt #709878 for amount of $225.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Mar 25, 2014 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Mar 25, 2014 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Oct 08, 2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Oct 08, 2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • CONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 819

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: FILED BY SANDRA KUHN MCCORMACK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY SANDRA KUHN MCCORMACK

    Read MoreRead Less