This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 04:46:09 (UTC).

COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC VS GREEN COMPASS ENVIRONMENTAL SOLUTIONS, LLC, ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GREEN COMPASS ENVIRONMENTAL SOLUTIONS, LLC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Taft / Maricopa Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Phillips, Craig G.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0037

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Taft / Maricopa Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Phillips, Craig G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC

Defendants

CVWW

CENTRAL VALLEY WASTE WATER, LLC

SANTA CLARA WASTE WATER COMPANY

GREEN COMPASS ENVIRONMENTAL SOLUTIONS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCORMACK, SANDRA KUHN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: Re: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: With Prejudice Entire Action, Duly Filed and Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • DocketAmended Proof of Service - Comment: by Personal Service as to Leonardo Reynoso

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: by Substituted Service as to CVWW aka Central Valley Waste Water, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: By Substituted Service as to Santa Clara Waste Water Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: By Substituted Service as to Green Compass Environmental Solutions, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 08/03/2015; Served: 08/17/20153:20 PM; Served: 08/03/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Returned Via SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketComplaint - Comment: For Breach of Oral Contract, Open Book Account, Accounts Stated, Quantum Meruit and Unjust Enrichment

    Read MoreRead Less