This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 04:46:14 (UTC).

COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC VS GIBSON EXPLORATION, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GIBSON EXPLORATION, LLC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Taft / Maricopa Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Phillips, Craig G.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0038

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Taft / Maricopa Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Phillips, Craig G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC

Defendant

GIBSON EXPLORATION, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCORMACK, SANDRA KUHN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail - Comment: Notice of Dismissal not entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Not Entered - Comment: For the Following Reason(s): Dismissal Previously Entered 9/25/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed; Comment: Re: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV); Party: Names: COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC; GIBSON EXPLORATION, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: With Prejudice as to Entire Action of All causes of action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: By Personal Service as to David Hartley, Authorized Agent for Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 08/01/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketComplaint - Comment: For Breach of Oral Contract, Open Book Account Stated, Quantum Meruit and Unjust Enrichment

    Read MoreRead Less