This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 03:51:24 (UTC).

COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC. VS DOWNHOLE KNOWLEDGE, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/29/2016 COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DOWNHOLE KNOWLEDGE, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R. and Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1476

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC.

Defendants

FERNANDEZ, CALISTRO

JOSE LUIS HERNANDEZ AKA JOSE L. HERNANDEZ AKA JOSE HERNANDEZ

DOWNHOLE KNOWLEDGE, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCORMACK, SANDRA KUHN

 

Court Documents

Court Trial

Court Trial 11/21/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: t/e 1 day; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: MCCORMACK, SANDRA KUHN

Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further

Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further 11/17/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CONTINUED FROM 11/03/2017; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: MCCORMACK, SANDRA KUHN

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 11/03/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: c/t & fcmc set 11/20/17 9am dept 11 t/e 1 days; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: MCCORMACK, SANDRA KUHN

Motion to Strike

Motion to Strike 09/06/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 7/28/17 Plaintiff, Commercial Trade, Inc. Notice of Motion and Motion for Order to Strike Defendant's Answer, Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion and Declaration of Sandra Kuhn McCormack ResID: 25344 ***************************************************** TENTATIVE: DENY MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER. LACK OF PERSISTENT, WILLFUL INTENT. SANCTION CAN BE AWARDED AS A COST OF SUIT. ******************************************************; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: MCCORMACK, SANDRA KUHN

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: VIA FILE & SERVE

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Reset

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RE: Motion - missing ResID

Case Management Conference

01/11/17 - M.O. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: MCCORMACK, SANDRA KUHN; Defendant: FERNANDEZ, CALISTRO

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: (continued from 11/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: Without Prejudice on Entire Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Trial - Court Trial 11/21/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: t/e 1 day

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Further - Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further 11/17/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CONTINUED FROM 11/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketFacsimile Transmission Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketRuling - Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Mandatory Settlement Conference 11/03/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: c/t & fcmc set 11/20/17 9am dept 11 t/e 1 days

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2016
  • DocketCertificate of Progress

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • DocketRuling - Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: 1 ATTEMPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO JOSE LUIS HERNANDEZ AKA JOSE L HERNANDEZ AKA JOSE HERNANDEZ, SUB SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO DOWNHOLE KNOWLEDGE,INC, SUB SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 07/12/2016; Served: 09/09/2016; Served: 07/18/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 10/12/16 Hearing Time: 08:30 Hearing Department/Division:11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less