This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 09/24/2022 at 07:03:32 (UTC).

COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC. VS CARRASCO

Case Summary

On 07/06/2022 COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CARRASCO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2985

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC.

Defendant

CARRASCO, CAROLYN D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCORMACK SANDRA KUHN

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

07/06/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Summons Issued and Filed

07/06/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Complaint

07/06/2022: Complaint

Order to Show Cause

07/08/2022: Order to Show Cause

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Division L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110; Dept.: Bakersfield Division L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 10/24/2022Hearing Time: 8:30amHearing Department/Division: L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMMERCIAL TRADE, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCORMACK, SANDRA KUHN