This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 03:17:00 (UTC).

COMMERCIAL TOWING VS BEYENE

Case Summary

On 07/10/2014 COMMERCIAL TOWING filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BEYENE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6238

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COMMERCIAL TOWING

Defendant

BEYENE, GEBERE E.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUERTA, EMILIO J

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: TO EMILIO J HUERTA: RETURNING DEFAULT JUDGMENT PACKAGE. PER COMMISSIONER LINDA S ETIENNE: THE DEMAND AMOUNT EXCEEDS LIMITED JURISDICTION. YOU CAN EITHER LOWER YOUR AMOUNT OR RECLASSIFY YOUR CASE, PAYING THE DIFFERENCE BETWEE $370.00 AND $435.00. PLEASE ADVISE. (PLACED IN PRO PER BIN UNDER "H")

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

12/07/16 MO: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd from 10/12/16.; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: HUERTA, EMILIO J

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 10/12/2016: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Re: imposition of additional sanctions as to plaintiff s counsel for failure to comply with California Rules of Court, Rule 3.110 and failure to appear at the Order to Show Cause hearing heard on 08/18/2016.; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: HUERTA, EMILIO J

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

08/18/16 MO; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: DISMISSAL: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd from 1/13/16, 4/5/16 and 5/25/16.

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

05/25/16 MO; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd from 01/13/16; 04/05/16; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: HUERTA, EMILIO J

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

04/05/16 MO: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd from 1/13/16; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: HUERTA, EMILIO J

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Minute Order- Order to Show Cause Re Dismissial 1/13/16: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: cont'd from 7/6/2015; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: HUERTA, EMILIO J

Ruling

9/11/15 MO: Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

7/6/15 Order to Show Cause re: dismissal: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: AND ORDER TO APPEAR RE: IMPOSITION OF ADDITIONAL SANCTIONS AS TO PLAINTIFF FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT 3.110 AND FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING HEARD ON 12/18/2014(CONT'D FROM 04/07/15); Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: HUERTA, EMILIO J

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: Cont'd from 12/07/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order Before Hearing; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: COMMERCIAL TOWING; Awarded Against: BEYENE, GEBERE E.; Status: Judgment; Status Date: 01/19/2017; Status Comment: 1. JUDGMENT is entered against Defendant GEBERE E. BEYENE; 2. Plaintiff shall be awarded and recover from Defendant GEBERE E. BEYENE $25,000.00, such amount representing: a. $10,942.50 for the cost of towing Defendant's GEBERE E. BEYENE'S 2001 Car-Hauler Trailer, Washington State License Plate No. 5065 VU, Vehicle ID No. 5EOAH 14481 G002040, (hereinafter Defendant's "Vehicle); b. $12,824.66 for the storage of Defendant's Vehicle from May 8, 2014 until November 21, 2014 (for a total of 197.3 days); and c. $1,232.84 for court costs and related expenses incurred by Plaintiff in seeking this judgment. 3. Furthermore, Plaintiff shall be s Vehicle as described above, in accordance with CA Vehicle Code Section 3072(f); Party: Names: COMMERCIAL TOWING; BEYENE, GEBERE E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: 1. JUDGMENT is entered against Defendant GEBERE E. BEYENE; 2. Plaintiff shall be awarded and recover from Defendant GEBERE E. BEYENE $25,000.00, such amount representing: a. $10,942.50 for the cost of towing Defendant's GEBERE E. BEYENE'S 2001 Car-Hauler Trailer, Washington State License Plate No. 5065 VU, Vehicle ID No. 5EOAH 14481 G002040, (hereinafter Defendant's "Vehicle); b. $12,824.66 for the storage of Defendant's Vehicle from May 8, 2014 until November 21, 2014 (for a total of 197.3 days); and c. $1,232.84 for court costs and related expenses incurred by Plaintiff in seeking this judgment. 3. Furthermore, Plaintiff shall be s Vehicle as described above, in accordance with CA Vehicle Code Section 3072(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Plaintiff 's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of its Application for Court Judgment for Breach of Contract and Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • DocketRequest for Court Judgment - Comment: as to GEBERE E BEYENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: TO EMILIO J HUERTA: RETURNING DEFAULT JUDGMENT PACKAGE. PER COMMISSIONER LINDA S ETIENNE: THE DEMAND AMOUNT EXCEEDS LIMITED JURISDICTION. YOU CAN EITHER LOWER YOUR AMOUNT OR RECLASSIFY YOUR CASE, PAYING THE DIFFERENCE BETWEE $370.00 AND $435.00. PLEASE ADVISE. (PLACED IN PRO PER BIN UNDER "H")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - 12/07/16 MO: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd from 10/12/16.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: wihtout prejudice; as to DOES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 10/12/2016: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Re: imposition of additional sanctions as to plaintiff s counsel for failure to comply with California Rules of Court, Rule 3.110 and failure to appear at the Order to Show Cause hearing heard on 08/18/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • DocketOrder to Appear and Order to Show Cause - Comment: 10/12/16, 830am, Dept 12

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2014
  • DocketNP1511 - Comment: Department: 12 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CRC, RULE 3.110. HEARING BEFORE TRIAL. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY ANY PARTY. *************************************************************************************** THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: SANCTIONS IMPOSED ON PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF $250.00 FOR FAILING TO COMPLY WITH CRC 3.110 TO BE STAYED FOR 30 DAYS, THE ORDER WILL BE AUTOMATICALLY VACATED IF THERE IS COMPLIANCE WITHIN THAT TIME, OTHER WISE THE ORDER WILL BECOME IMMEDIATELY EFFECTIVE. SANCTIONS WILL BECOME DUE AND PAYABLE. THE COURT SETS THIS MATTER FOR A FURTHER ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL AND ORDER TO APPEAR RE: IMPOSITION OF ADDITIONAL SANCTIONS TO PLAINTIFF FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT 3.110 AND FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING HEARD ON 10/23/2014. HEARING SET: 12/18/2014 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 12. NOTICE TO ISSUE FROM THE COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2014
  • Docket4159 Order to Show Cause - (N20a - CRC 3.110) - Comment: Hearing Entered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2014
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Original Type: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • Docket844L Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint > $10,000 GC 70613(A) - Comment: Amount of $370.00 for COMMERCIAL TOWING (PL-1). Received from COMMERCIAL TOWING, check no(s) 2724. Receipt #788667 for amount of $370.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2014
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: BUSINESS MUST BE REPRESENTED BY AN ATTORNEY SUMMONS NOT ISSUED RETURNED VIA PRO PER BIN "C"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2014
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: OSC 105

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2014
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Oct 23, 2014 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Oct 23, 2014 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2014
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2014
  • DocketComplaint - Comment: FILED BY COMMERCIAL TRADE CMC 1/6/15 830 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2014
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.