This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 06/03/2020 at 07:36:24 (UTC).

COMBS VS COMBS

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 COMBS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against COMBS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0355

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COMBS, TABITHA

Respondent

COMBS, JIMMIE

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 03/23/2020: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 02/03/2020: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Judgment

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 02/03/2020: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Department Transfer

Hearing on Waiver of Fees

Hearing on Waiver of Fees 01/27/2020: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 11/05/2018: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Dismissed; Parties Present Petitioner: COMBS, TABITHA; Respondent: COMBS, JIMMIE

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing - Granted In Whole - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing on Waiver of Fees - Hearing on Waiver of Fees 01/27/2020: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketNotice on Hearing About Court Fees - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketConfidential Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketRequest For Hearing About Court Fees (FW-006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied / Ineligible - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.