This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:49:25 (UTC).

COLLECTIBLES MANAGEMENT RESOURCES, A GENERAL PARTNERSHIP VS WESTRUM ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 COLLECTIBLES MANAGEMENT RESOURCES, A GENERAL PARTNERSHIP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WESTRUM. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1850

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COLLECTIBLES MANAGEMENT RESOURCES, A GENERAL PARTNERSHIP

Defendants

NATALIE IDA MARTINEZ AKA NATALIE IDA ESTRADA

WESTRUM, JUSTIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DENNING, STEPHEN M

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) 03/19/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: Re: imposition of additional sanctions as to plaintiff's counsel for failure to comply with California Rules of Court, Rule 3.740(f) and failure to appear at the Order to Show Cause hearing heard on 03/19/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: COLLECTIBLES MANAGEMENT RESOURCES, A GENERAL PARTNERSHIP; Awarded Against: WESTRUM, JUSTIN; NATALIE IDA MARTINEZ AKA NATALIE IDA ESTRADA; Amount; Damages: $1,459.18; Pre-Judgment Interest: $494.12; Attorney Fees: $291.83; Costs: $301.00; Total: $2546.13; Party: Names: COLLECTIBLES MANAGEMENT RESOURCES, A GENERAL PARTNERSHIP; WESTRUM, JUSTIN; NATALIE IDA MARTINEZ AKA NATALIE IDA ESTRADA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: as to JUSTIN WESTRUM; NATALIE IDA MARTINEZ aka NATALIE IDA ESTRADA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: You and each of you, are ordered to appear before the court on May 29, 2018 at 8:30 a.m. in Department/Division 12 of the above entitled court, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed, or other sanctions imposed for your failure to comply with the Special Rules for Administration of Civil Litigation and more specifically: failing to comply with California Rules of Court, Rule 3 740(f) and for failing to appear at the Order to Show Cause scheduled for Mareh 19 2018. . Sanctions imposed on counsel for plaintiff in the amount of $250.00 for failing to comply with California Rules of Court, Rule 3 740(1) to be stayed for 30 days, the order will be automatically vacated if there is compliance within that time, otherwise the order will become immediately effective. Sanctions will become due and payable.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) 03/19/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • DocketDeclaration and Order - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: Accepting copies in Lieu of Originals

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO NATALIE IDA MARTINEZ , PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO JUSTIN WESTRUM, SUB SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 04/21/2017; Served: 04/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA S.A.S.E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: UNDER CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: RE: REDUCED FILING FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less