This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:47:47 (UTC).

COLLECTIBLES MANAGEMENT RESOURCES, A GENERAL PARTNERSHIP VS JESSE RIOS AKA JESSE LONG AKA JESSE LONG RIOS, ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 COLLECTIBLES MANAGEMENT RESOURCES, A GENERAL PARTNERSHIP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JESSE RIOS AKA JESSE LONG AKA JESSE LONG RIOS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0214

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COLLECTIBLES MANAGEMENT RESOURCES, A GENERAL PARTNERSHIP

Defendants

JESSE RIOS AKA JESSE LONG AKA JESSE LONG RIOS

RIOS, JUAN BLAS

JESSE RIOS

RIOS, JUAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DENNING, STEPHEN M

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Other

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Fee Waiver-Hearing on Waiver of Fees (Pre-Disposition)

Fee Waiver-Hearing on Waiver of Fees (Pre-Disposition) 07/06/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Parties Present Defendant: RIOS, JUAN

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • DocketConfidential Document - Comment: JUDGE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing - Granted In Whole - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFee Waiver-Hearing on Waiver of Fees (Pre-Disposition) - Fee Waiver-Hearing on Waiver of Fees (Pre-Disposition) 07/06/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: ---------------FILED ON DEMAND, NAME & ADDRESS CHANGED DUE TO ANSWER--------------

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: as to Jesse Rios aka Jesse Long aka Jesse Long Rios

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: as to Juan Blas Rios

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: under code of civil procedure 1033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: of Donna L. Kelley [B & P CODE 6322.1 (c)(1); GC 70614 (b); CCP 116.420]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less