This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 10:05:41 (UTC).

COLISE, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS BARTON ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/26/2017 COLISE, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BARTON. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark, Thomas S. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1710

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Clark, Thomas S.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COLISE, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

BARTON, LARRY

BARTON, JANICE MAJORS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOMINGUEZ, DARIN

Defendant Attorney

LANDSGAARD, OLAF A

 

Court Documents

Demurrer

Demurrer 01/31/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 1/18/18 Defendant, LARRY BARTON; JANICE MAJORS BARTON Demurrer to First Amended Complaint ResID: 28805; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: DOMINGUEZ, DARIN; Defendant; Attorney: LANDSGAARD, OLAF A; Defendant; Attorney: LANDSGAARD, OLAF A

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Demurrer to First Amended Complaint - case is not consolidated

Motion to Strike

Motion to Strike 12/13/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 11/20/17 Defendant, LARRY BARTON; JANICE MAJORS BARTON Motion to Strike Complaint ResID: 27347; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: DOMINGUEZ, DARIN; Defendant; Attorney: LANDSGAARD, OLAF A; Defendant; Attorney: LANDSGAARD, OLAF A

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Motion - missing first appearance fees and reservation ID.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: SUMMONS DOES NOT CONFORM TO COMPLAINT.

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date:11/8/17 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:17

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2019
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketDemurrer - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Case Consolidation; Comment: DEFENDANT LARRY BARTON, JANICE MAJORS BARTON DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Case Consolidation; Comment: THIS CASE HAS BEEN CONSOLIDATED WITH BCV-17-101674-SDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemurrer - Demurrer 01/31/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 1/18/18 Defendant, LARRY BARTON; JANICE MAJORS BARTON Demurrer to First Amended Complaint ResID: 28805

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketReply - Comment: Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Demurrer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Case Management Conference 01/22/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketDeclaration (Meet and Confer)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: Demurrer to First Amended Complaint Hearing Date: 1/31/18 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketDemurrer - Comment: DEMURRER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketOpposition - Comment: to Defendants' Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO LARRY BARTON, PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO JANICE MAJORS BARTON, PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: SUMMONS DOES NOT CONFORM TO COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date:11/8/17 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/26/2017; Served: 10/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less