Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 05:00:13 (UTC).

COACHELLA VALLEY COLLECTION SERVICE VS KWIATKOWSKI, ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/13/2015 COACHELLA VALLEY COLLECTION SERVICE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KWIATKOWSKI. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stainfield, Bryan K., DelPellegrino, Victoria, Green, Kenneth R., Jr., Bittleston, Dawn, Webster, Jason W. and Glennon, Donald P., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0111

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stainfield, Bryan K.

DelPellegrino, Victoria

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Bittleston, Dawn

Webster, Jason W.

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COACHELLA VALLEY COLLECTION SERVICE

Defendants

MINER, CAROLYN ELIZABETH

KWIATKOWSKI, GRZEGORZ

KWIATKOWSKI, CAROLYN ELIZABETH

KWIATKOWSKI, GREGORZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GALLEGOS, JOHN D

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 11/09/2017: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 09/07/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ENTRY OF DEFAULT PACKET ADDRESSING MONEY

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 07/06/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEFAULT PACKAGE

Case Management Conference

01/12/19 MO: Case Management Conference/Order to Show Cause: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

07/07/16 MO: Order to Show Cause / Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer(s): DelPellegrino, Victoria, Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

Case Management Conference

**MO - Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer: DelPellegrino, Victoria; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Request for court judgment & judgment

Ruling

Ruling 11/01/2017: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Ruling 08/02/2017: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 06/01/2017: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 04/20/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

01/23/17 MO: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

Ruling

**MO - Public: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) 10/06/2016: Judicial Officer(s): DelPellegrino, Victoria, Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Multiple Motions-Similar Issues

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

**MO - Order to Show Cause: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketWrit Returned Unsatisfied - Comment: Kern County. Issued on 1/5/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketAbstract Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: Kern County. Mail to Coachella Valley Collection Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: COACHELLA VALLEY COLLECTION SERVICE; Awarded Against: KWIATKOWSKI, GRZEGORZ; MINER, CAROLYN ELIZABETH; Amount; Damages: $10,609.20; Pre-Judgment Interest: $5,833.65; Attorney Fees: $1,841.00; Costs: $872.50; Total: $19156.35; Party: Names: COACHELLA VALLEY COLLECTION SERVICE; KWIATKOWSKI, GRZEGORZ; MINER, CAROLYN ELIZABETH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 11/09/2017: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • DocketAffidavit - Comment: OF SHERRI GRACE IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: OF JOHN D. GALLEGOS IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND VERIFICATION OF ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2016
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: GREGORZ KWIATKOWSKI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: CAROLYN ELIZABETH MINER AKA CAROLYN ELIZABETH KWIATKPWSKI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - **MO - Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer: DelPellegrino, Victoria; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - **MO - Order to Show Cause: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less