This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/20/2018 at 19:39:07 (UTC).

CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. VS MACLEAN, ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/07/2016 CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MACLEAN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0057

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.

Defendants

JUANITA POLLOCK

MACLEAN, NORMAN

NORMAN MACLEAN III

MACLEAN, JUANITA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOVE, FRANKLIN J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Other Court-Ordered Dism Before Trial (CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • Proof of Service - Comment: Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • Statement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.