This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:55:38 (UTC).

CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. VS JAMES

Case Summary

On 10/21/2016 CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JAMES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S. and Robertson, Murray J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5799

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Robertson, Murray J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.

Defendants

JAMES, ANTHONY

JAMES, TIFFANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOVE, FRANKLIN J

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) 10/03/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2018
  • Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: crc 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed; Comment: Cont'd from 10/03/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Ruling - Ruling: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • Notice of Settlement Conditional (JBSIS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) 10/03/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • Amendment to Complaint - Comment: ***ETIENNE*** DOE 1: TIFFANY JAMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • Proof of Service - Comment: As to Anthony James. Personal Service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Declaration - Comment: RE: REDUCED FILING FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less