Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 05/05/2021 at 13:38:37 (UTC).

CLIFFORD DALE GLENN DECEASED

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 CLIFFORD DALE GLENN DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2331

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GLENN, CLIFFORD WAYNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DANLEY, KEVIN M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketPetition for Letters - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Comment: PROPER TO BE SUBMITTED ON THE PLEADING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketWaiver - Comment: of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate - Comment: Notice with signed POS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketWaiver - Comment: of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketConfidential Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketConfidential Information - Comment: DE-147

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketWaiver - Comment: of notice of proposed action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Request to Set Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DANLEY, KEVIN M